Trustees SOUTHEND-ON-SEA MUSICAL FESTIVAL ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 283503
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hilary Elizabeth Williams | Chair | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cheralyn Eileen Bason | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Lindsey | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Claire Belinda Golding | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Ian Stuart Browne | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Rosina Bearman | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Stanley Ryan | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Bearman | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JOHN MEDCALF | Trustee | 29 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
JENA CHUN-WAH PANG | Trustee |
|
||||||
ISOBEL MARY KENNEDY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LOUISE ANN CASSON MANDERS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.