Governance THE LINCOLN COLLEGE BOAT CLUB SOCIETY
Charity number: 283583
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 24 November 1981: Standard registration
- 09 February 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 03 April 2013: Re-registered
- 09 February 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
- 16 February 2016: Re-registered
- 09 February 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
- 05 April 2018: Re-registered
- 09 February 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- 02 March 2019: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.