Trustees SHISHUKUNJ
Charity number: 284206
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jayesh Dhanani | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Harshiv Shah | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dipali Shah | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hemal Shah | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sneha Varshani | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mehul Patel | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paayal Mithani | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Raj Mistry | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sunita Mehta | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pratik Shah | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Naeshma Hirani | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kajal Shah | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rishi Haria | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Niraj Shah | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Krishna Shah | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bineet Shah | Trustee | 28 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Suraj Shah | Trustee | 28 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nitin Mehta | Trustee | 28 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mahel Shah | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ketan Damani | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
KAMLESH SHAH | Trustee | 18 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
BHUPEN SHAH | Trustee | 20 March 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.