Trustees THE SIKH SOCIETY OF MILTON KEYNES
Charity number: 284603
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darshan Singh Lotey | Chair | 08 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harmeet Singh Kochhar | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gurpal Singh Dhillon | Trustee | 03 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jagdev Singh | Trustee | 03 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Balvir Singh Marwaha | Trustee | 03 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harmeet Singh Chhabra | Trustee | 03 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jisbeer Kaur Lotey | Trustee | 03 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jaswant Singh Ruprai | Trustee | 03 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jagjit Singh | Trustee | 03 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
RANBIR KAUR BAGA | Trustee | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harbans Kaur Sidhu | Trustee | 08 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
JAGIR SINGH RAI | Trustee | 12 September 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.