Governance GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST APOSTOLIC INC
Charity number: 284747
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 17 May 1982: Standard registration
- 09 June 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 25 October 2011: Re-registered
- 09 June 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 09 August 2019: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- General Assembly (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.