Governing document WARMINSTER SCHOOL PARENTS' ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 285207
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 02/07/1982 AS AMENDED ON 28/04/2014 AS AMENDED ON 16 JAN 2017 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 29 APR 2019 as amended on 14 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING, AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF, FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION IN THE SCHOOL NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE GOVERNORS
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.