Trustees WARMINSTER SCHOOL PARENTS' ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 285207
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Alison Margaret Kennedy | Chair | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Cook | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Webber | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Anne Gibson | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Lale Brown | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Liisa Kirsten Wallace | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Camilla Suzanne Wheatley-Hubbard | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Anne Fryer | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Morgan-Nash | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Frances Hall | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Ann Hunnibell | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nichola Jane Wagstaff | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julie Victoria Sharpe | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Saunders | Trustee | 10 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Walmsley | Trustee | 11 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Robertson | Trustee | 12 September 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.