Governing document THE BRITISH SOCIETY FOR CLINICAL NEUROPHYSIOLOGY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/04/1951 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/10/1971 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/10/1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/10/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/10/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/10/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/10/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/03/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/06/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/10/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14/10/2011 as amended on 08 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE SCIENCE AND PRACTICE OF CLINICAL NEUROPHYSIOLOGY AND RELATED SCIENCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.