Trustees THE BRITISH TOXICOLOGY SOCIETY
Charity number: 286197
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof. Vicki Stone | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Timothy Gant | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rani Ghosh | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ehi Idahosa-Taylor | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ian Copple | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hazem Matar | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Bryony Ross | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr PHILIP ANDREW BOTHAM | Trustee | 20 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Fiona Sewell | Trustee | 17 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
PROF SHIRLEY PRICE | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.