Trustees OLD TOWN YOUTH CLUB
Charity number: 286889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN GEORGE HOMES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
RONALD FRANCIS ANTHONY LEOW | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
VERONICA ANGLIN | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW KEITH PATTEN | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karen Barnes | Trustee | 25 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Curtis Lawrence | Trustee | 25 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Paul Songer | Trustee | 27 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
HELEN DAWN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STANLEY KENNETH FOWLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR RAY EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.