Governing document SHREE VISHWAKARMA ASSOCIATION OF UNITED KINGDOM
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26TH JUNE 1983 AS AMENDED ON 26TH OCTOBER 1997 as amended on 31 Oct 2009 as amended on 29 May 2016 as amended on 15 Aug 2022 as amended on 26 Jun 2016 as amended on 08 Nov 2020 as amended on 30 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE HINDU RELIGION, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE, AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE SUTHAR COMMUNITY COMPRISING GURJAR, VAINSH, MEVADA AND PANCHOLI.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.