Governing document 4CHILDREN
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 FEBRUARY 1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18 NOVEMBER 2000, 28 FEBRUARY 2008 AND 14 MAY 2009. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE CARE AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN NEED OF CARE DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND SCHOOL HOLIDAYS AND TO PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH CHILDREN IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PERSONS PROVIDING SUCH CARE AND EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES. (C) TO CONDUCT RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF THE CARE, EDUCATION AND RECREATION OF SUCH CHILDREN AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.