Governing document EAST KENT ITEC LTD
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEM AND ARTS OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 OCTOBER 1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 13 MARCH 1986, 28 MAY 1987, 13 OCTOBER 1988, 16 OCTOBER 1991, 14 MAY 1993, 29TH AUGUST 1997 AND 16 MARCH 2001.
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE VOCATIONAL PREPARATION, TRAINING AND RETRAINING PEOPLE, MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE RESIDENT AND/OR BEING EMPLOYED OR TRAINED BY ORGANISATIONS BASED IN THE COUNTY OF KENT. (B) TO RELIEVE NEED AMONG UNEMPLOYED PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE COUNTY OF KENT THROUGH THE CREATION OF NEW JOBS AND TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES AND PROGRAMMES.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF KENT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.