Governing document KHANIQAHI NIMATULLAHI
Charity number: 289194
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION ADOPTED 26 FEBRUARY 1984 AS AMENDED 2 AUGUST 1984, 30 MAY 1985, 12 MARCH 1987, 24 JULY 1988, 24 JANUARY 2009 AND 13 DECEMBER 2015
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE SPIRITUAL TEACHING OF SUFISM. 2. TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BECAUSE OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
UNDEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.