Governing document BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR HOLISTIC MEDICINE & HEALTH CARE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED OF 31ST MARCH 1984 AS VARIED BY DEED OF VARIATION OF 8TH NOVEMBER 1984 AND 10 JUNE 2002 as amended on 15 Jun 2020 as amended on 13 Feb 2021 as amended on 03 Oct 2022 as amended on 15 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
{The Association is established} to explore, educate and inform doctors, medical students, other healthcare professions and members of the general public in the principles and practice of compassionate holistic medicine and health care.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.