Trustees ROYAL SOCIETY OF MARINE ARTISTS
Charity number: 289944
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Scott Martin | Chair | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Simpson | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Myers | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Curtis | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Allain | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Hunt | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karl Elliott Terry | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey William Huband | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Gordon Williams | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Charles Ryland Palmar | Trustee | 10 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Mulcahy | Trustee | 10 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Conrad Brown | Trustee | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.