Trustees CONSTRUCTION HISTORY SOCIETY
Charity number: 291453
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr JAMES CAMPBELL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Fiona Smyth | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
YITING PAN | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Aaron Bill | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nick von Behr | Trustee | 02 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM MCLEAN | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr CHRISTINE WALL | Trustee | 11 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN LEE | Trustee | 24 June 2014 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL ANTHONY TUTTON | Trustee | 30 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL STUART DRIVER | Trustee | 30 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL HEATON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr DAVID YEOMANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NINA BAKER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.