Trustees WHITSTABLE AND DISTRICT CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 291589
Charity reporting is up to date (26 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger John Fagg | Chair | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Leggatt | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Kernighan | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keith Fowler | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kirsten Jane Valentine | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Caroline Poole | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Feast | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew John Young | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jean Gray | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID THOMAS LISTON-JONES | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Edwards | Trustee | 19 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
RUSSELL FEAST | Trustee | 19 July 2016 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.