Trustees BAMPTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 291659
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY HALL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Andrew Drake | Trustee | 26 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Smith | Trustee | 18 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Angela Irvin | Trustee | 18 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Angela Newland | Trustee | 27 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET WILLIAMS | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.