Trustees Portsmouth Historic Quarter Trust
Charity number: 293188
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID BUTTERS | Chair | 16 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAUL BENNETT | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Henry Flint | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|||||
BENJAMIN FRENCH | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Helen Green | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Verdon | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tarek Teba | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rear Admiral Rex John Cox | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Virginia Adair Gibson | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Stephen Mark Christopher Pitt | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Robert John Hudson Palmer | Trustee | 08 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAL COHEN | Trustee | 28 May 2009 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.