Governing document THE ELIZABETH FOUNDATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/11/1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/02/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/07/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/06/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/01/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/04/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF DEAF AND HARD OF HEARING CHILDREN AND ADULTS BY THE PROVISION OF HELP AND ASSISTANCE TO THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND BY THE PROMOTION OF THE EARLY DETECTION OF DEAFNESS AND HEARING LOSS IN BABIES AND YOUNG CHILDREN, AND THE PROMOTION OF HIGH QUALITY AUDIOLOGICAL CARE AND SUPPORT FOR ALL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.