Governing document NETA TRAINING TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17TH AUGUST 1967 AS AMENDED 3RD APRIL 1980, 20TH DECEMBER 1985 AND 21ST SEPTEMBER 1988 AND 27TH MARCH 1990 24TH JANUARY 2004 AND 15 DECEMBER 2006 as amended on 10 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE ADEQUATE TRAINING OF PERSONS EMPLOYED OR INTENDING TO BE EMPLOYED IN INDUSTRY AND COMMERCE. (B) SUBJECT TO THE FOREGOING OBJECT, TO EXTEND SUCH TRAINING TO MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.