Trustees THEATRE PECKHAM
Charity number: 294399
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gwanwoo Min | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Olusola Oyeleye | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Prendergast | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jelil Akinwande | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gabrielle Broomes | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anni Domingo | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Natasha Brown | Trustee | 27 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
David William Ryman Richards | Trustee | 26 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Aurea Garrido Serrato | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Endy Irenee Mckay | Trustee | 30 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon Lungile Ivan Manyonda | Trustee | 30 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Jane Preston | Trustee | 30 July 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.