Governing document CORNWALL GUILD OF WEAVERS SPINNERS AND DYERS
Charity number: 295583
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 MARCH 1952 AS AMENDED 20 JUNE 1986, 19 JANUARY 2007, 18 JANUARY 2008 AND 16 JANUARY 2009
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE GUILD SHALL BE TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE WHICH WILL ENCOURAGE THE EXERCISE AND MAINTAIN THE STANDARDS OF THE CRAFTS OF WEAVING SPINNING AND DYEING AND TO FOSTER PROMOTE AND INCREASE THE INTEREST OF THE PUBLIC THEREIN.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.