Trustees THE ABTA BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity number: 295819
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derek Jones | Chair | 04 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Lorraine Baxter-Hurley | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Stirrup | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John North | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Peter Scottford Buck | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Belinda Ruth Vazquez | Trustee | 10 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALISTAIR ROWLAND | Trustee | 26 September 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.