Accounts and annual returns NEWHAM BOYS' CLUB
Charity number: 296255
Charity reporting is overdue by 141 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 141 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 141 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 06 September 2023 | 129 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 22 June 2023 | 418 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 August 2021 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 21 June 2020 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window