Trustees GLOUCESTERSHIRE FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY
Charity number: 296959
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amelia Katharyn Bennett | Chair | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jack | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Richard Loosley | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judith Victoria Thorpe | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Patricia Schollar | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID POOLE | Trustee | 09 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ANTHONY HOWELLS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.