Trustees SALTASH HERITAGE
Charity number: 297525
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jean Dorothy Dent | Chair | 25 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Donald Fredrick Berrey | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Jeremy Davy | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Emily Bullock | Trustee | 25 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Mark Barrett | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Arthur Hearl | Trustee | 18 September 2017 |
|
|||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH HOOPER MBE | Trustee | 02 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Adam Killeya | Trustee | 02 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mr Kevin Richards | Trustee | 07 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Caldwell | Trustee | 07 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS JACKIE AUSTIN | Trustee | 19 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN EDWARD SAINSBURY LISTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Elizabeth Ann ASPREY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEVIN HALE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRUCE Ellis HUNT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.