Trustees THE CROSSNESS ENGINES TRUST
Charity number: 297585
Charity reporting is up to date (21 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Fay Jepson | Trustee | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Beacock | Trustee | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Wai Kin Chin | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Raymond George Fleming | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Frederick Kennedy Germanus-Kunda | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Jones | Trustee | 25 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Miles Ridley | Trustee | 06 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Greg Warner | Trustee | 10 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Albert Neher | Trustee | 14 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER JAMES NELSON | Trustee | 24 March 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.