Governing document TRIRATNA CAMBRIDGE
Charity number: 297894
Charity reporting is up to date (86 days late)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 01/03/1987 AS AMENDED ON 11/10/1987 AS AMENDED ON 21/01/2004 AS AMENDED ON 11/02/2009 AS AMENDED ON 17/06/2010 AS AMENDED ON 29/11/2012
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE BUDDHIST RELIGION
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.