Accounts and annual returns CRICKLADE PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
Charity number: 298208
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | 29 February 2012 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 22 July 2011 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | 22 July 2011 | 22 days late | |
Annual return | 31 May 2009 | 08 February 2010 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2009 | 08 February 2010 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2008 | 31 March 2009 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2008 | 31 March 2009 | On time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window