Governing document STREET FORGE WORKSHOPS LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9TH DECEMBER 1987 AS AMENDED 19 APRIL 1996 BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 12 DECEMBER 1997, 7 SEPTEMBER 2005 AND 30 MAY 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING BY PROVIDING FOR THE CARE, ACCOMMODATION, TRAINING, EDUCATION, FUTURE LIVING, EMPLOYMENT, OCCUPATION AND SUSTENANCE OF PHYSICALLY OR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED PERSONS IN ORDER TO FOSTER AND ENCOURAGE A SENSE OF INDEPENDENCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.