Trustees BRAMDEAN AND HINTON AMPNER WOMENS INSTITUTE
Charity number: 298568
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marian Bennet | Chair | 17 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joan Gilchrist | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Wood | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sue Gerrard | Trustee | 17 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Jane Rothery | Trustee | 19 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA LUNN | Trustee | 20 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Bulloch | Trustee | 20 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ANNE MORRIS | Trustee | 19 May 2008 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.