Trustees RICHMOND SCIENTIFIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 298665
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr NICHOLAS ROY STAPLEY | Chair | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Grant Lewison FRSA | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Terence George Robson | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Nash | Trustee | 11 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alvin Maurice Elliott | Trustee | 07 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID DANIEL WILLIAMS BSC | Trustee | 17 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN FREDERICK BRADBURY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.