Trustees CROFTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 299777
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Sheldrake | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Corrinne Powell | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Patricia Wilson | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Terresa Ann Cardy | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Diane Mabel Davies | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Anne Benstead | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Ash | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Gwendoline Mary Leach | Trustee | 09 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JANET LESLEY BIDDLECOMBE | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY BROUGHTON | Trustee | 14 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARIAN BARBARA MORRIS | Trustee | 17 February 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.