Accounts and annual returns THE AES TRING THEATRE APPEAL
Charity number: 299969
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2007 | 25 June 2008 | 117 days late | |
Annual return | 30 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2006 | 24 June 2008 | 482 days late | |
Annual return | 30 April 2005 | 28 February 2006 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2005 | 28 February 2006 | On time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2004 | 11 March 2005 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2004 | 11 March 2005 | 11 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window