Trustees HENLOW/CLIFTON SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 300457
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Devereux | Chair | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Coombs | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Fisher | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Jenkinson | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Parrish | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Davidson | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
George Hunt | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Panton | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Panton | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.