Trustees FALMOUTH AND PENRYN UNIT OF THE SEA CADET CORPS
Charity number: 300538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL CHARLES NIXON | Chair | 02 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Elliott WEETCH | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Alan BROOK | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAUL FERGUSSON GLOVER | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Arden CLAY | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA McSORLEY | Trustee | 02 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
SARAH JANE PAYNE | Trustee | 02 August 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.