Trustees GRAMPOUND WITH CREED WAR MEMORIAL RECREATION GROUND AND PUBLIC HALL
Charity number: 300547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dean Jenkins | Chair | 30 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Llewellyn | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Sharp | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Donald Ford | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Ward | Trustee | 30 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Cat Evans | Trustee | 18 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Alison Ryves | Trustee | 18 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Kay Chapman | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARK TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.