Trustees LIVEWIRE YOUTH PROJECT
Charity number: 300632
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Trethewey | Chair | 05 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Andrew Moir | Trustee | 08 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Michael Snook | Trustee | 08 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Bryan Ivan Baker | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Peggs | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Anthony Chiswell | Trustee | 11 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Andrew Thomas Jacques | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Michael Studden | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Wilson | Trustee | 09 May 2017 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.