Trustees THE HORRABRIDGE YOUTH CLUB
Charity number: 300863
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Huda | Chair | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Roche | Trustee | 14 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Doyle | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Harvey-Smith | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mike John King | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Elizabeth Rowe | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Jane Gregory | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sara Elizabeth Cruickshank | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
PAULA LOUISE KENDALL | Trustee | 28 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT MITCHELMORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET KENDALL CA | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.