Trustees YELVERTON WAR MEMORIAL RECREATION FIELD AND VILLAGE HALL TRUST
Charity number: 301025
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN BOSTON | Chair | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Bowler | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
NINA MARGARET CUNNINGHAM | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
ALASTAIR CLARK CUNNINGHAM | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOSIE LOUISE GENTLE | Trustee | 19 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER LOUISE COLLINS | Trustee | 19 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
PHILLIP COLLINS | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Mulholland | Trustee | 05 August 2021 |
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER DOUGLAS WEBBER | Trustee | 04 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
HILARY THOMASSON | Trustee | 22 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
HELEN FORD | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
SARA ASPLEY | Trustee | 23 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
TONY SAMUEL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.