Trustees SEWARDS END VILLAGE HALL TRUST
Charity number: 301390
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH BRIGGS | Chair | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Chitson | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gail Biggs | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Powell | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Argent | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Hall | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mike Rushmer | Trustee | 30 June 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.