Trustees TAKELEY VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 301409
Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Newman | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Johnson | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jane Bridgeman | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paul Leonard Burnett | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Carol Ann Pratt | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Wray | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL COLEMAN | Trustee | 07 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
Eric Rogers | Trustee | 01 January 2000 |
|
|
||||
John Monk | Trustee | 01 January 1970 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.