Trustees BATHURST SWIMMING BATHS
Charity number: 301568
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Love | Trustee | 24 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julia Maxine Caley | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm John Smith | Trustee | 08 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Wheeler | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Michael Thomas Powell | Trustee | 03 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Spender | Trustee | 10 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Eagles | Trustee | 18 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mathew Jones | Trustee | 30 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Jones | Trustee | 23 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roger Martin Lambert | Trustee | 23 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Denise Baker | Trustee | 23 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew George Hayward | Trustee | 15 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Lambert | Trustee | 06 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
NEIL THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COLIN JAMES KNIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBIN BERRYMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Sheila Berryman | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.