Governing document STINCHCOMBE HILL RECREATION GROUND
Charity number: 301620
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01/01/1930 AND TRUST DEED DATED 15/03/1938 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES 11/05/1964 AND 02/11/1999 AND 02/11/2011
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF A PUBLIC RECREATION GROUND.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
PARISHES OF STINCHCOMBE,CAM,DURSLEY AND NORTH NIBLEY.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.