Trustees CATISFIELD MEMORIAL HALL
Charity number: 301774
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nick Morrish | Chair | 20 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Alan Baxter | Trustee | 15 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Patrick King | Trustee | 15 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Davies | Trustee | 15 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sue Baddeley | Trustee | 23 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Tier | Trustee | 19 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
JON EDWARD HAYLOCK | Trustee | 20 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Glenn Duggan | Trustee | 21 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROGER GROVE | Trustee | 18 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
DOUG PHARAOH | Trustee | 24 May 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.