Trustees 3RD TEWKESBURY SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 302125
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adam Fendt | Chair | 04 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Mary Huck-Jones | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harry George Gerald Gibbens | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Mary Daly | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Wheeler | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Liza Marie Gardiner-Orton | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malgorzata Lidia Kula | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Jayne Clements | Trustee | 31 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
OLIVER MYLES COOPER | Trustee | 12 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nicky Fendt | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Robert Dixon | Trustee | 20 May 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.