Trustees 63RD BRISTOL (ST ANDREW WITH ST BARTHOLOMEW) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 302164
Charity reporting is overdue by 171 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Druett | Chair | 14 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Anita Craig | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julie Stevenson | Trustee | 07 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Stonham | Trustee | 14 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Steven Dylan Peregrine Phillips | Trustee | 14 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Victory-Rowe | Trustee | 14 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Debra Stiles | Trustee | 14 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Scholar | Trustee | 14 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mark Andrew Watts | Trustee | 14 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JAMES EVANS | Trustee | 01 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Oliver Johnson | Trustee | 14 June 2006 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.