Trustees 4th Eling Sea Scouts
Charity number: 302268
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kyle Michael Williamson | Chair | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Williamson | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard James White | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Kathleen MacPhee | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Moody | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alex James Moody | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jill Doherty | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karen Mould | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
DONNA OVENDEN | Trustee | 26 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Maurice Foster | Trustee | 12 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAUL BULLOCK | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.